HI SCR226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Civil Rights Curriculum For Public School Students.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Develop And Implement A Civil Rights Curriculum For Public School Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan, Yamane, Okimoto. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2022-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3552) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR226 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to GVO/LCA.
SR219 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR219 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.