HI SCR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Counties To Study How Inclusionary Zoning Impacts Housing Supply.
Title
Requesting The Counties To Study How Inclusionary Zoning Impacts Housing Supply.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HOU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR2 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 32
SR3 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR3 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.