HI SCR189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR189
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming Support For The Purchase, Preservation, And Restoration Of Agricultural And Conservation Lands In Maunawili Valley, Oahu To Protect The Important Ancient And Historic Sites, Trails, And Waters In Maunawili Valley.
Title
Affirming Support For The Purchase, Preservation, And Restoration Of Agricultural And Conservation Lands In Maunawili Valley, Oahu To Protect The Important Ancient And Historic Sites, Trails, And Waters In Maunawili Valley.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 861). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 861). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-15-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1474) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR189 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR154 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL/AEN.
SR154 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL/AEN.