HI SCR180 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Report Of The Wireless Enhanced 911 Fund.
Title
Wireless Enhanced 911 Fund; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro, Takai, Wooley excused. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1377-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to PBS, referral sheet 73 | |
2010-04-15 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-15-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 513) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Waived referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2914), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Hee, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-29-10 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-31-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-10 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR81 (Same As) 2010-04-08 - (S) Resolution Adopted.