HI SCR170 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Judiciary To Consider Written Statements From Victims Or Families Of Victims When Approving A Plea-bargain.
Title
Requesting The Judiciary To Consider Written Statements From Victims Or Families Of Victims When Approving A Plea-bargain.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR170 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
SR135 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to JDC.
SR135 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to JDC.