HI SCR165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning To Establish An Agricultural Housing Task Force To Study Existing County And State Laws, Rules, And Processes To Plan For The Construction Of On-farm Employee Housing Within The State Agricultural District.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning To Establish An Agricultural Housing Task Force To Study Existing County And State Laws, Rules, And Processes To Plan For The Construction Of On-farm Employee Housing Within The State Agricultural District.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1708) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR165 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - The committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.