HI SCR164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR164
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Spreckelsville, Wailuku, Maui, For The Existing Seawall And Boulder Revetment And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Spreckelsville, Wailuku, Maui, For The Existing Seawall And Boulder Revetment And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2293), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2267), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:40AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1841) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR164 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR110 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR110 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=164&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR164_.HTM |