HI SCR161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating July 20, 2019, As "tranquility Base Day" In Hawaii To Honor The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Apollo 11 Lunar Landing At Tranquility Base And Urging The United Nations Educational, Scientific, And Cultural Organization To Include Tranquility Base And Associated Artifacts On The World Heritage List.
Title
Designating July 20, 2019, As "tranquility Base Day" In Hawaii To Honor The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Apollo 11 Lunar Landing At Tranquility Base And Urging The United Nations Educational, Scientific, And Cultural Organization To Include Tranquility Base And Associated Artifacts On The World Heritage List.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2246), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:45AM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 631). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR161 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR120 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR120 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=161&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR161_.HTM |