HI SCR151 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR151
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 591). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1901), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-15-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1727), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Ohno, Quinlan. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 540) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1314) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR151 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR156 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR156 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).