HI SCR151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR151
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Conjunction With The Department Of Agriculture, To Study The Economic Impacts Of Vertical Farming Operations.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, In Conjunction With The Department Of Agriculture, To Study The Economic Impacts Of Vertical Farming Operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to AEN/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR151 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.