HI SCR151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Award A Congressional Gold Medal Collectively To Filipino Veterans Of World War Ii.
Title
Filipino World War Two Veterans; United States Congress; Congressional Gold Medal
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2016-03-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-30-16. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3193) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=151&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR151_.HTM |