HI SCR149 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR149
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging And The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Convene A Working Group To Review In-home Care Services And Make Recommendations To Improve The Quality Of Care And Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Administrative Rules To Protect Consumers.
Title
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging And The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Convene A Working Group To Review In-home Care Services And Make Recommendations To Improve The Quality Of Care And Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Administrative Rules To Protect Consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-24-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 829). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2076-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2049-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 04-12-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3452) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to CPH. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from LBR/HRE/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3295), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/HRE/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to LBR/HRE/HMS, CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR149 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to HWN/CPH, WAM.
HCR120 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to LAB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR120 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to LAB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 39