HI SCR147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR147
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Reevaluate The Rental Assistance Program.
Title
Encouraging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Reevaluate The Rental Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2285), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2232), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hashimoto. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 629). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1829) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HOU. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR147 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=147&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR147_.HTM |