HI SCR141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Display All Works Of Art In Its Collection And To Make Publicly Available On The Internet Photographs And Information Of Every Work Of Art In The Foundation's Collection.
Title
State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; Art in Public Places
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 722). |
2013-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Carroll excused (2). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1723), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 58 |
2013-04-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 04-19-13 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 663). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=141&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR141_.HTM |