HI SCR141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 67
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study Of Systems Or Plans That May Accommodate The Department Of Education's Need To Retain, Promote, And Competitively Compensate Professional Employees In Certain Areas, Without Requiring Those Employees To Assume Supervisory Responsibilities, And A Study Of The Advantages And Disadvantages Of The Department Of Education's Adoption Of A System Similar To The University Of Hawaii's Executive/management System.
Title
Educational Officers; Classification and Compensation Plan; Study
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Reported from EDH/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3105) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-16-10 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Galuteria, Tsutsui; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/LBR added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-15-10 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH/LBR. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Offered. |