HI SCR14 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to JHA, FIN , referral sheet 21
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Referred to JHA, FIN , referral sheet 21
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Establish And Maintain Hawaiian Cultural Centers Within The State.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To Establish And Maintain Hawaiian Cultural Centers Within The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN , referral sheet 21 |
2023-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-23. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR12 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.