HI SCR139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR139
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Registration And Regulation Of Transient Vacation Unit Owners As "professional Guest House Operators".
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Registration And Regulation Of Transient Vacation Unit Owners As "professional Guest House Operators".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1582), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR139 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.