HI SCR137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Insurance Commissioner Establish And Convene An Insurance Modernization Working Group To Update And Modernize Hawaii's Property, Casualty, And Life Insurance Laws.
Title
Requesting That The Insurance Commissioner Establish And Convene An Insurance Modernization Working Group To Update And Modernize Hawaii's Property, Casualty, And Life Insurance Laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2000-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Mizuno, Tokioka. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-12-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 532) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3478) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3280), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR137 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
HCR144 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR144 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39