HI SCR13 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 41-669 Inoaole Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii.
Title
Sale of the Leased Fee Interest in 41-669 Inoaole Street, Waimanalo, Hawaii
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 727). |
2014-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-29 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2). |
2014-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1702-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-17 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Jordan; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-17 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 309. |
2014-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Hanohano, Jordan voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1678-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-04-14 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano. |
2014-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 04-14-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 435). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3234) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2858), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Slom. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=13&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SCR13_.HTM |