HI SCR122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.
Title
Urging The Governor To Nominate Opportunity Zones To Assist With Economic Development In Census Tracts In Wahiawa And Whitmore Village.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2245), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:45AM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1706) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR122 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=122&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR122_.HTM |