HI SCR12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Utilization Of Best Management Practices In Irrigation To Conserve Outdoor Water Usage Within The Landscape.
Title
LICH; Landscape Irrigation Best Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from ENE/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Referred to ENE/PGM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Offered. |