HI SCR118 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CAI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CAI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Research The Designation Of November 20th Of Each Year As Makahiki Commemoration Day, Which Is Requested To Be Recognized As An Unpaid State Holiday.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Research The Designation Of November 20th Of Each Year As Makahiki Commemoration Day, Which Is Requested To Be Recognized As An Unpaid State Holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to CAI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 610) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from GVO/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1631) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to GVO/TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |