HI SCR117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR117
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Public Utilities To Provide Fifty Percent Rate Discounts To Retired Senior Citizens.
Title
Requesting Public Utilities To Provide Fifty Percent Rate Discounts To Retired Senior Citizens.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR117 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=117&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR117_.HTM |