HI SCR117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Chairperson Of The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Report To The Legislature, No Later Than December 15, 2011, On The Progress Of The Koke'e State Park Advisory Council.
Title
Kokee State Park Advisory Council; Report to Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) One Day Notice 04-15-11. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-11 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to WLH. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |