HI SCR117 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Souki excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Souki excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Building Of Modular And Factory Manufactured Homes In Hawaii.
Title
Modular and Manufactured Homes; Support
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Souki excused. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353-10), recommending referral to EBM. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Chang, Har, C. Lee, Morita. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-14-10 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-14-10 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Referred to HSG, EBM, referral sheet 58 | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) One Day Notice 03-30-10. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Reported from EDH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2856) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Gabbard. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-10 2:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDH/TIA. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR48 (Same As) 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to EDH/TIA.