HI SCR114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Referred to HED/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 57
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Referred to HED/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 57
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii System To Examine The Feasibility Of Re-establishing The Advanced Certificate In Gerontology Program, To Consider Establishing A Research Education And Mentorship Program To Support Research On Aging, And To Explore Ways To Build Capacity To Meet The Aging-related Workforce Needs Of The State.
Title
University of Hawaii; Center on Aging
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (H) Referred to HED/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 57 | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 413) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) One Day Notice 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 1:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to EDU/HMS. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |