HI SCR113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Complex Area Superintendents Of Baldwin-kekaulike-maui And Hana-lahainaluna-lanai-molokai Complex Areas To Look At The District Boundaries Of All Schools To Address Overcrowding, The Number Of Geographic Exceptions, And The Number Of Hawaiian Immersion Students Attending Outside Of District To Better Align The District Boundaries And Establish Hawaiian Immersion Programs In Other Districts.
Title
Requesting The Complex Area Superintendents Of Baldwin-kekaulike-maui And Hana-lahainaluna-lanai-molokai Complex Areas To Look At The District Boundaries Of All Schools To Address Overcrowding, The Number Of Geographic Exceptions, And The Number Of Hawaiian Immersion Students Attending Outside Of District To Better Align The District Boundaries And Establish Hawaiian Immersion Programs In Other Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR113 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=113&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR113_.HTM |