HI SCR113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Examine Palliative Care Services And Develop Recommendations To Expand Palliative Care Services In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Working Group To Examine Palliative Care Services And Develop Recommendations To Expand Palliative Care Services In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3281), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR113 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to JDL.
HCR118 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR118 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=113&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR113_.HTM |