HI SCR110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The Supreme Court Of The United States To Adopt A Formal Ethics Code For The Justices.
Title
Strongly Urging The Supreme Court Of The United States To Adopt A Formal Ethics Code For The Justices.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3683) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR110 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to EET/PSM.
SR97 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR97 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.