HI SCR11 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR11
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Include The Teaching Of Financial Literacy In The Existing Personal Transition Plan Course Requirement For Each Student.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Include The Teaching Of Financial Literacy In The Existing Personal Transition Plan Course Requirement For Each Student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR11 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR68 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27
HCR68 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=11&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR11_.HTM |