HI SCR11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 818).
2019-04-18HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-18HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Holt, McDermott, Ohno, Todd excused (5).
2019-04-18HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2279), recommending adoption.
2019-04-17HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey.
2019-04-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-17-19 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2237), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 49
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-01SenateOne Day Notice 04-02-19.
2019-04-01SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1674) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-21SenateRe-Referred to GVO.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2019-01-22SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR74 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback