HI SCR106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health, Department Of Transportation, And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Take Any Action Possible To Reduce The Carbon Emissions Arising From Airplane Transportation To And From The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health, Department Of Transportation, And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Take Any Action Possible To Reduce The Carbon Emissions Arising From Airplane Transportation To And From The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1868-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3596) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR181 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
SR88 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
SR88 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24