HI SCR102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR102
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring June 27 Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Title
Declaring June 27 Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2250), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 562). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR102 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR211 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HCR211 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=102&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR102_.HTM |