HI SCR10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Impact Assessment Report On Legislation Mandating Coverage Of Palliative Care.
Title
Mandatory Insurance Coverage for Palliative Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 610) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Slom; and 4 Excused: English, Espero, Kim, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-13-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-16-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The public hearing scheduled on 03-11-11 at 2:45PM in conference room 229 has been cancelled. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Offered. |