HI SB994 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to LAB, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to LAB, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a public official or public employee from appointing, employing, promoting, or advancing a relative within an agency over which the public official or public employee exercises control or the relative of another public official or employee employed by or exercising control over the same agency, except for a person who is highly qualified for the position. Prohibits legislators from appointing, employing, or voting to confirm a relative. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Nepotism; Standards of Conduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to LAB, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 228) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 558) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |