HI SB99 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 176, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits any county from disqualifying a legal nonconforming dwelling unit from the Housing Choice Voucher Program if the unit meets zoning and building code requirements and other program standards such as health and safety standards. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Housing Choice Voucher Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 176, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
2017-07-12SenateAct 176, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92).
2017-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2017-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-17 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Espero, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2017-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675).
2017-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 510).
2017-04-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-07HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1727), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward.
2017-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Har, Ichiyama, McKelvey, Tokioka excused (5).
2017-03-20HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-03-14HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
2017-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 77) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele.
2017-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-02-17SenateReported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2017-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2017-01-20SenateReferred to PSM/HOU, WAM.
2017-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB82 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback