HI SB989 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB989
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends fines for destroying or harvesting trees including koa on state forest reserves lands to an amount up to $10,000 or three times the market value at the time and place of the violation for each tree including koa, whichever is greater, in addition to any administrative fines and costs associated with restoration or replacement of the habitat and damages to public land or natural resources, or any combination thereof. Clarifies that any person violating part II (Forest Reserves) of chapter 183, Hawaii Revised Statutes (HRS), or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, other than section 183-17, HRS, shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor. Repeals the general penalty provision of chapter 183, HRS. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Department Of Land And Natural Resources Violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1123 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB989 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB989 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.