HI SB987 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB987
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the uses and application of the transaction fee for filings in the Bureau of Conveyances authorized under Act 120, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009. Clarifies that the transaction fee shall be repealed on the effective date of administrative rules adopted by the Department of Land and Natural Resources that include the establishment of a transaction fee or on July 1, 2022, whichever occurs first. (SB987 HD1)
Title
Relating To Recordation Transaction Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 499). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-15-17 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads K., Gabbard, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Thielen L.. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB987 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224.
HB1121 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1121 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5