HI SB987 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the assessment of impact fees prior to issuance of a water meter and requires that impact fees be collected in full before or upon issuance of the water meter. Effective 07/01/2013. (HD1)
Title
Impact Fees; Assessment and Collection; Water Meter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 582). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Thielen voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor amendment failed following a voice vote: Noes, 2 (Representative(s) Evans, Tokioka). Excused, 0 (none). |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment No. 21 offered by Rep. Thielen. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 263) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 673) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |