HI SB986 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a transient accommodations broker to register as a tax collection agent for its operators and plan managers. Requires operators and plan managers to provide a statement to the transient accommodations broker confirming compliance with all applicable land use and tax laws. Requires the operator or plan manager to provide verification of compliance with state and county land use laws. Requires an operator or plan manager to remove a transient accommodation advertisement upon notice that the property is not in compliance with state law or county ordinance. Establishes a 1-time amnesty program for certain delinquent transient accommodations and general excise tax obligations. Authorizes counties to require the disgorgement of profits obtained through unlawful actions. Authorizes counties to adopt ordinances to amortize or phase out transient accommodations. Allocates up to $1,000,000 of TAT revenues to each county, contingent upon the county establishing a process to provide verification of compliance by an operator or plan manager with county land use laws. Makes it unlawful for transient accommodations brokers to engage in business with operators or plan managers or property managers or activity providers that are not in compliance with all state laws and county ordinances. Makes it unlawful for a hosting platform to provide, and collect a fee for, booking services regarding transient accommodations that are not lawfully certified, registered, or permitted under applicable county ordinance.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB986 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
HB1472 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1472 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Amnesty
Booking Services
Brokers
General Excise Tax
Hosting Platform
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals
Booking Services
Brokers
General Excise Tax
Hosting Platform
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=986&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB986_.HTM |