HI SB982 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires more specificity in all concurrent resolutions for the review of proposed sale or gifts of state land, including whether the land was classed as government or crown lands prior to 8/15/95. Requires a copy of the resolution be submitted to OHA 6 months prior to the appropriate legislative session.
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Lands Controlled by the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on HWN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/WLH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 4:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HWN/WLH/JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=982 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB982_.HTM |