HI SB981 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to send notices of hearing electronically. Requires the party seeking judicial review to bear the cost of preparing a transcript, except as provided by law, in which case the Board shall bear the cost of preparing the transcript. (SB981 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Relations Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-10 | House | Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB981 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB1115 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 122, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
HB1115 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 122, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Subjects
Electronic Service of Hearing Notice
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Transcripts
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Transcripts