HI SB981 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the DOH to provide public health statistics records to law enforcement officers for evidence in criminal investigations.
Title
Public Health Statistics Records; Disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 310) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=981&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB981_.HTM |