HI SB980 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB980
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards of conduct for firearm industry members. Authorizes the attorney general or any county attorney or public prosecutor to bring a civil action against a firearm industry member for violation of standards of conduct.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=980&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB980_.HTM |