HI SB98 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the tax liability for low-income taxpayers by creating a tax credit that will reduce a taxpayer's income tax to a minimum amount if the taxpayer's federal and Hawaii adjusted gross income falls below certain thresholds. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB98 HD1)
Title
Reduction of Tax Liability; Low Income Taxpayers
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:20PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Kidani, Kouchi. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Choy, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-13 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 76) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |