HI SB975 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit by changing the tax credit cap to $6,000,000 per year for the 2013 tax year and $7,000,000 per year for the 2014 and 2015 tax years, and $7,500,000 per year thereafter. Creates a livestock feed tax credit from 1/1/2013 to 12/31/2013. Creates livestock feed development tax credit from 1/1/2014 to 12/31/2015. Appropriates funds for staffing and consulting expenses.
Title
Agriculture; Livestock Feed; Livestock Feed Development; Tax Credit; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1384 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=975&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB975_.HTM |