HI SB974 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Assists agricultural enterprises in the State by authorizing the State to issue special purpose revenue bonds for their benefit. Contingent upon ratification of constitutional amendment authorizing the State to issue special purpose revenue bonds and use the proceeds from the bonds to assist agricultural enterprises. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Agricultural Enterprises
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB737 (Same As) 2013-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).