HI SB969 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning January 1, 2022, prohibits the manufacture or importation for sale of certain animal fur products in the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animal Fur Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takumi, Ward.
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
2021-04-15SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 537).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1870) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-07HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-04-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-31HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-21.
2021-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:15AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
2021-02-16SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN, CPN/JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback