HI SB968 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 202, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 202, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to collaborate with the Department of Transportation to develop, implement, administer, and manage a program to enable parking stall sharing among public employees of the State and a pilot project to provide bicycle storage lockers at facilities where parking is made available to public employees. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 202, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 202, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1305). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 125) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 125). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Matayoshi, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Fevella. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-23 11:00AM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 984). |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Lee, Inouye Co-Chairs; Elefante, Fevella. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Matayoshi, Kila Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2023-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1935), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from TRN/LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Tam, Alcos. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/LGO on Tuesday, 03-21-23 11:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 4:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO/TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1419 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3