HI SB958 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB958
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Chief Election Officer, with assistance from the county clerks for elections involving county offices and countywide ballot issues, to publish an online voters' pamphlet on the Office of Elections' public website and publish and distribute postcards notifying voters of the online voters' pamphlet website address. Appropriates moneys to allow the chief election officer to produce and distribute an online voters' pamphlet and voters' pamphlet postcards for each election. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-12-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB958 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.